|
06/14/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
06/14/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#1957
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Record vote RV#519
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Amended 1-Phelan
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#501
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Amended 4-Stickland
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 3-Stickland
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Point of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 2-Stickland
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#500
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2019
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|