Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1177 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019