1 | | - | H.B. No. 1177 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Phelan, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1177 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 15, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1177 By: Creighton |
---|
11 | | - | (1) the person carries the handgun while: |
---|
12 | | - | (A) evacuating from an area following the |
---|
13 | | - | declaration of a state of disaster under Section 418.014, |
---|
14 | | - | Government Code, or a local state of disaster under Section |
---|
15 | | - | 418.108, Government Code, with respect to that area; or |
---|
| 20 | + | (1) the person carries the handgun in a concealed |
---|
| 21 | + | manner; |
---|
| 22 | + | (2) the person carries the handgun while: |
---|
| 23 | + | (A) evacuating from an area following a mandatory |
---|
| 24 | + | evacuation order issued during a state of disaster declared under |
---|
| 25 | + | Section 418.014, Government Code, or a local state of disaster |
---|
| 26 | + | declared under Section 418.108, Government Code, with respect to |
---|
| 27 | + | that area; or |
---|
18 | | - | (2) not more than 168 hours have elapsed since the |
---|
19 | | - | state of disaster or local state of disaster was declared, or more |
---|
20 | | - | than 168 hours have elapsed since the time the declaration was made |
---|
21 | | - | and the governor has extended the period during which a person may |
---|
22 | | - | carry a handgun under this subsection; and |
---|
23 | | - | (3) the person is not prohibited by state or federal |
---|
24 | | - | law from possessing a firearm. |
---|
25 | | - | (l) Sections 46.02, 46.03(a)(1), (a)(2), (a)(3), and |
---|
26 | | - | (a)(4), and 46.035(a), (a-1), (a-2), (a-3), (b)(1), (b)(5), and |
---|
27 | | - | (b)(6) do not apply to a person who carries a handgun if: |
---|
28 | | - | (1) the person carries the handgun on the premises, as |
---|
29 | | - | defined by the statute providing the applicable offense, of a |
---|
30 | | - | location operating as an emergency shelter during a state of |
---|
31 | | - | disaster declared under Section 418.014, Government Code, or a |
---|
32 | | - | local state of disaster declared under Section 418.108, Government |
---|
33 | | - | Code; |
---|
34 | | - | (2) the owner, controller, or operator of the premises |
---|
35 | | - | or a person acting with the apparent authority of the owner, |
---|
36 | | - | controller, or operator, authorized the carrying of the handgun; |
---|
37 | | - | (3) the person carrying the handgun complies with any |
---|
38 | | - | rules and regulations of the owner, controller, or operator of the |
---|
39 | | - | premises that govern the carrying of a handgun on the premises; and |
---|
| 30 | + | (3) not more than 48 hours have elapsed since the |
---|
| 31 | + | mandatory evacuation order was issued, or more than 48 hours have |
---|
| 32 | + | elapsed since the mandatory evacuation order was issued and the |
---|
| 33 | + | governor has extended the period during which a person may carry a |
---|
| 34 | + | concealed handgun; and |
---|
42 | 40 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
43 | 41 | | to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
44 | 42 | | An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is |
---|
45 | 43 | | governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, |
---|
46 | 44 | | and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For |
---|
47 | 45 | | purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the |
---|
48 | 46 | | effective date of this Act if any element of the offense was |
---|
49 | 47 | | committed before that date. |
---|
50 | 48 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
51 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
52 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
53 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1177 was passed by the House on April |
---|
54 | | - | 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 102, Nays 29, 2 present, not |
---|
55 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
56 | | - | H.B. No. 1177 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
57 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
58 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
59 | | - | on H.B. No. 1177 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 91, |
---|
60 | | - | Nays 52, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
61 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
63 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1177 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
64 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 22, Nays |
---|
65 | | - | 9; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
66 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
67 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
68 | | - | 1177 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 16, Nays 15. |
---|
69 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
71 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
72 | | - | Date |
---|
73 | | - | __________________ |
---|
74 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 49 | + | * * * * * |
---|