|
06/02/2019
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/02/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/21/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Record vote RV#1131
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Amended 1-Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Record vote RV#1094
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 4-Tinderholt
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 3-Sherman
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 3-Sherman
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Record vote RV#1093
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment adopted as amended 1-Martinez
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment amended 2-Cain, Clardy, and Landgraf
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Martinez
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Point of order overruled Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1), and Rule 8, Section 3; Article III, Section 35
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|