Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1631 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 28, 2019