Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1631 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1631
1+By: Stickland, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 1631
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019;
3+ May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Transportation; May 16, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 6, Nays 2; May 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to prohibiting the use of photographic traffic signal
612 enforcement systems.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 707, Transportation Code,
915 is amended to read as follows:
1016 CHAPTER 707. PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC SIGNAL
1117 ENFORCEMENT SYSTEM PROHIBITED
1218 SECTION 2. Chapter 707, Transportation Code, is amended by
1319 adding Sections 707.020 and 707.021 to read as follows:
1420 Sec. 707.020. PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC SIGNAL ENFORCEMENT
1521 SYSTEM PROHIBITED. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a local
1622 authority may not implement or operate a photographic traffic
1723 signal enforcement system with respect to a highway or street under
1824 the jurisdiction of the authority.
1925 (b) The attorney general shall enforce this section.
2026 Sec. 707.021. USE OF EVIDENCE FROM PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC
2127 SIGNAL ENFORCEMENT SYSTEM PROHIBITED. Notwithstanding any other
2228 law, a local authority may not issue a civil or criminal charge or
2329 citation for an offense or violation based on a recorded image
2430 produced by a photographic traffic signal enforcement system.
2531 SECTION 3. Section 27.031(a), Government Code, is amended
2632 to read as follows:
2733 (a) In addition to the jurisdiction and powers provided by
2834 the constitution and other law, the justice court has original
2935 jurisdiction of:
3036 (1) civil matters in which exclusive jurisdiction is
3137 not in the district or county court and in which the amount in
3238 controversy is not more than $10,000, exclusive of interest;
3339 (2) cases of forcible entry and detainer; and
3440 (3) foreclosure of mortgages and enforcement of liens
3541 on personal property in cases in which the amount in controversy is
3642 otherwise within the justice court's jurisdiction[; and
3743 [(4) cases arising under Chapter 707, Transportation
3844 Code, outside a municipality's territorial limits].
3945 SECTION 4. Section 780.003(b), Health and Safety Code, is
4046 amended to read as follows:
4147 (b) The account is composed of money deposited to the credit
4248 of the account under the [Sections 542.406 and 707.008,]
4349 Transportation Code[,] and under Section 780.002 of this code.
4450 SECTION 5. Section 133.004, Local Government Code, as
4551 amended by Chapters 718 (H.B. 2359), 1027 (H.B. 1623), and 1149
4652 (S.B. 1119), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007,
4753 is reenacted and amended to read as follows:
4854 Sec. 133.004. CIVIL FEES. This chapter applies to the
4955 following civil fees:
5056 (1) the consolidated fee on filing in district court
5157 imposed under Section 133.151;
5258 (2) the filing fee in district court for basic civil
5359 legal services for indigents imposed under Section 133.152;
5460 (3) the filing fee in courts other than district court
5561 for basic civil legal services for indigents imposed under Section
5662 133.153;
5763 (4) the filing fees for the judicial fund imposed in
5864 certain statutory county courts under Section 51.702, Government
5965 Code;
6066 (5) the filing fees for the judicial fund imposed in
6167 certain county courts under Section 51.703, Government Code;
6268 (6) the filing fees for the judicial fund imposed in
6369 statutory probate courts under Section 51.704, Government Code;
6470 (7) fees collected under Section 118.015;
6571 (8) marriage license fees for the family trust fund
6672 collected under Section 118.018;
6773 (9) marriage license or declaration of informal
6874 marriage fees for the child abuse and neglect prevention trust fund
6975 account collected under Section 118.022; and
7076 (10) the filing fee for the judicial fund imposed in
7177 district court, statutory county court, and county court under
7278 Section 133.154[; and
7379 [(11) the portion of the civil or administrative
7480 penalty described by Section 542.406(c)(1), Transportation Code,
7581 imposed by a local authority to enforce compliance with the
7682 instructions of a traffic-control signal;
7783 [(11) the portion of the civil or administrative
7884 penalty described by Section 707.008(a)(1), Transportation Code,
7985 imposed by a local authority to enforce compliance with the
8086 instructions of a traffic-control signal].
8187 SECTION 6. The following are repealed:
8288 (1) Section 29.003(g), Government Code;
8389 (2) Sections 542.405, 542.406, and 544.012,
8490 Transportation Code; and
8591 (3) Sections 707.001(2), 707.002, 707.0021, 707.003,
8692 707.004, 707.005, 707.006, 707.007, 707.008, 707.009, 707.010,
8793 707.011, 707.012, 707.013, 707.014, 707.015, 707.016, 707.017,
8894 707.018, and 707.019, Transportation Code.
8995 SECTION 7. (a) Notwithstanding any provision of this Act to
9096 the contrary, if before May 7, 2019, a local authority had enacted
9197 an ordinance to implement a photographic traffic signal enforcement
9298 system under Sections 542.405 and 542.406, Transportation Code, or
9399 Chapter 707, Transportation Code, and entered into a contract for
94100 the administration and enforcement of the system:
95101 (1) the local authority may continue to operate the
96102 system under that ordinance and under the terms of that contract
97103 until the expiration date specified in the contract as the contract
98104 existed on May 7, 2019; and
99105 (2) the photographic traffic signal enforcement
100106 system, and any proceeding initiated or civil or administrative
101107 penalty imposed after the effective date of this Act are governed by
102108 the applicable law in effect immediately before the effective date
103109 of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
104110 purpose.
105111 (b) Subsection (a) of this section does not apply to a
106112 contract for the administration and enforcement of a photographic
107113 traffic signal enforcement system entered into before May 7, 2019,
108114 that authorizes termination of the contract on the basis of adverse
109115 state legislation.
110116 (c) Neither the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles nor a
111117 county assessor-collector may refuse to register a motor vehicle
112118 alleged to have been involved in a violation of former Chapter 707,
113119 Transportation Code, solely because the owner of the motor vehicle
114120 is delinquent in the payment of a civil penalty imposed under that
115121 chapter as permitted under Subsection (a) of this section.
116122 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
117123 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
118124 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
119125 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
120126 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
121- ______________________________ ______________________________
122- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
123- I certify that H.B. No. 1631 was passed by the House on May 8,
124- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 109, Nays 34, 3 present, not
125- voting.
126- ______________________________
127- Chief Clerk of the House
128- I certify that H.B. No. 1631 was passed by the Senate on May
129- 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 23, Nays 8.
130- ______________________________
131- Secretary of the Senate
132- APPROVED: _____________________
133- Date
134- _____________________
135- Governor
127+ * * * * *