Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Record vote RV#941
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Record vote RV#868
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Amended 2-Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Amended 1-Springer
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2019
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|