By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1649 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019; May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 2; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1649 By: Birdwell A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the amount of and vehicles eligible for the light-duty motor vehicle purchase or lease incentive program. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 386.154(d), Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: (d) A new light-duty motor vehicle powered by an electric drive is eligible for a $2,500 incentive if the vehicle: (1) has four wheels or is a motorcycle as defined by Section 541.201, Transportation Code; (2) was manufactured for use primarily on public streets, roads, and highways; (3) has not been modified from the original manufacturer's specifications; (4) has a maximum speed capability of at least 55 miles per hour; (5) is propelled to a significant extent by an electric motor that draws electricity from a hydrogen fuel cell or from a battery that: (A) has a capacity of not less than four kilowatt hours; and (B) is capable of being recharged from an external source of electricity; [and] (6) was acquired on or after September 1, 2013, or a later date as established by the commission, by the person applying for the incentive under this subsection and for use or lease by that person and not for resale; and (7) is not a motor-assisted scooter, pocket bike, or minimotorbike as those terms are defined by Section 551.351, Transportation Code. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *