Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1649 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1649
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019;
3- May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
4- Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2019, reported
5- adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
6- vote: Yeas 9, Nays 2; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1649 By: Birdwell
1+By: Kuempel H.B. No. 1649
92
103
114 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
125 AN ACT
136 relating to the amount of and vehicles eligible for the light-duty
147 motor vehicle purchase or lease incentive program.
158 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
16- SECTION 1. Section 386.154(d), Health and Safety Code, is
17- amended to read as follows:
9+ SECTION 1. Section 386.154, Health and Safety Code, is
10+ amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (f) to
11+ read as follows:
1812 (d) A new light-duty motor vehicle powered by an electric
1913 drive is eligible for a $2,500 incentive if the vehicle:
2014 (1) has four wheels or is a motorcycle as defined by
21- Section 541.201, Transportation Code;
15+ 541.201, Transportation Code;
2216 (2) was manufactured for use primarily on public
2317 streets, roads, and highways;
2418 (3) has not been modified from the original
2519 manufacturer's specifications;
2620 (4) has a maximum speed capability of at least 55 miles
2721 per hour;
2822 (5) is propelled to a significant extent by an
2923 electric motor that draws electricity from a hydrogen fuel cell or
3024 from a battery that:
3125 (A) has a capacity of not less than four kilowatt
3226 hours; and
3327 (B) is capable of being recharged from an
3428 external source of electricity; [and]
3529 (6) was acquired on or after September 1, 2013, or a
3630 later date as established by the commission, by the person applying
3731 for the incentive under this subsection and for use or lease by that
3832 person and not for resale; and
3933 (7) is not a motor-assisted scooter, pocket bike, or
4034 minimotorbike as those terms are defined by Section 551.351,
4135 Transportation Code.
36+ (f) A person that receives the incentive described by
37+ Subsection (d) shall remit $750 to the comptroller to deposit to the
38+ credit of the state highway fund.
4239 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
4340 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
4441 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
4542 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
4643 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
47- * * * * *