|
06/14/2019
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/14/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#1959
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Record vote RV#514
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|