1 | | - | H.B. No. 3636 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Morrison (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 3636 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Criminal Justice; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3636 By: Whitmire |
---|
8 | | - | SECTION 1. (a) Not later than December 31, 2029, and |
---|
| 18 | + | SECTION 1. Chapter 442, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
| 19 | + | adding Subchapter B-1 to read as follows: |
---|
| 20 | + | SUBCHAPTER B-1. STAR OF THE REPUBLIC MUSEUM |
---|
| 21 | + | Sec. 442.061. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "museum" |
---|
| 22 | + | means the Star of the Republic Museum. |
---|
| 23 | + | Sec. 442.062. JURISDICTION AND MAINTENANCE OF MUSEUM. (a) |
---|
| 24 | + | The museum and its contents are under the jurisdiction of the Texas |
---|
| 25 | + | Historical Commission. The commission is responsible for the |
---|
| 26 | + | preservation, maintenance, and operation of the museum. |
---|
| 27 | + | (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), Blinn College District |
---|
| 28 | + | maintains ownership of the museum, the land on which the museum is |
---|
| 29 | + | located, and the artifacts in the museum. |
---|
| 30 | + | (c) Except as provided by Subsection (b), any power or duty |
---|
| 31 | + | related to the museum formerly vested in any other state agency or |
---|
| 32 | + | entity is vested solely in the commission. |
---|
| 33 | + | (d) The commission shall, in coordination with an advisory |
---|
| 34 | + | committee appointed by the board of trustees of the Blinn College |
---|
| 35 | + | District, promote the educational and public awareness programs at |
---|
| 36 | + | the museum, the Washington-on-the-Brazos State Historic Site, and |
---|
| 37 | + | the Barrington Living History Farm. |
---|
| 38 | + | Sec. 442.063. GRANTS; DONATIONS. The commission may accept |
---|
| 39 | + | a grant or donation for any program or purpose of the museum. |
---|
| 40 | + | SECTION 2. (a) On January 1, 2020, the following are |
---|
| 41 | + | transferred to the Texas Historical Commission: |
---|
| 42 | + | (1) all powers and duties of Blinn College District |
---|
| 43 | + | relating to the Star of the Republic Museum; |
---|
| 44 | + | (2) all unobligated and unexpended funds |
---|
| 45 | + | appropriated, donated, or contributed to Blinn College District |
---|
| 46 | + | designated for the administration of any part of the Star of the |
---|
| 47 | + | Republic Museum; and |
---|
| 48 | + | (3) all files and other records of Blinn College |
---|
| 49 | + | District kept by Blinn College District regarding the Star of the |
---|
| 50 | + | Republic Museum. |
---|
| 51 | + | (b) Notwithstanding any other law, Blinn College District |
---|
| 52 | + | shall continue to perform functions and activities related to the |
---|
| 53 | + | Star of the Republic Museum until January 1, 2020, and the former |
---|
| 54 | + | law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
| 55 | + | SECTION 3. (a) Not later than December 31, 2029, and |
---|
12 | 59 | | (b) The transfer authorized by Subsection (a) of this |
---|
13 | 60 | | section must be for consideration in an amount not less than the |
---|
14 | 61 | | fair market value of the property. The historical fair market value |
---|
15 | 62 | | of the real property as of December 2, 1992, shall be offered to |
---|
16 | 63 | | establish the fair market value of the property. |
---|
17 | 64 | | (c) The General Land Office shall negotiate and close a |
---|
18 | 65 | | transaction under this section on behalf of the Texas Board of |
---|
19 | 66 | | Criminal Justice. |
---|
20 | 67 | | (d) Section 31.158, Natural Resources Code, does not apply |
---|
21 | 68 | | to a transaction under this section. |
---|
23 | 70 | | Criminal Justice is land being situated in DeWitt County, Texas, |
---|
24 | 71 | | and more particularly described as follows: |
---|
25 | 72 | | BEING all that certain parcel or tract containing 100.00 Acres of |
---|
26 | 73 | | land out of the Samuel Lockhart League A-28 located in DeWitt |
---|
27 | 74 | | County, Texas, and being out of the easterly portion of a called |
---|
28 | 75 | | 464.03-Acre tract described in deed to the Texas Department of |
---|
29 | 76 | | Criminal Justice-State of Texas from the City of Cuero recorded in |
---|
30 | 77 | | Vol. 360 Page 139 in the deed records of said County; |
---|
31 | 78 | | Said 100.00-Acre tract being bounded as follows: |
---|
32 | 79 | | 1. On the north, by the northerly line of a said 464.03-Acre |
---|
33 | 80 | | tract; |
---|
34 | 81 | | 2. One the east, by the easterly line of said 464.03-Acre |
---|
35 | 82 | | tract; |
---|
36 | 83 | | 3. On the south, by the southerly line of said 464.03-Acre |
---|
37 | 84 | | tract; |
---|
38 | 85 | | 4. On the west, by a line being perpendicular to the |
---|
39 | 86 | | southerly line of said 464.03-Acre tract, at a location |
---|
40 | 87 | | sufficiently west of the easterly line of said 464.03-Acre tract so |
---|
41 | 88 | | as to include exactly 100.00 Acres of land. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
49 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3636 was passed by the House on April |
---|
50 | | - | 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
51 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
52 | | - | H.B. No. 3636 on May 24, 2019, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
53 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
54 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
55 | | - | on H.B. No. 3636 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, |
---|
56 | | - | Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
57 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
59 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3636 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
60 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
61 | | - | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
62 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
63 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
64 | | - | 3636 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
65 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
67 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Date |
---|
69 | | - | __________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 94 | + | * * * * * |
---|