Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3636 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2019

                            H.B. No. 3636


 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice to DeWitt County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  Not later than December 31, 2029, and
 subject to Subsections (b), (c), and (d) of this section, the Texas
 Board of Criminal Justice shall transfer to DeWitt County the real
 property described by Section 2 of this Act.
 (b)  The transfer authorized by Subsection (a) of this
 section must be for consideration in an amount not less than the
 fair market value of the property. The historical fair market value
 of the real property as of December 2, 1992, shall be offered to
 establish the fair market value of the property.
 (c)  The General Land Office shall negotiate and close a
 transaction under this section on behalf of the Texas Board of
 Criminal Justice.
 (d)  Section 31.158, Natural Resources Code, does not apply
 to a transaction under this section.
 SECTION 2.  The real property held by the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice is land being situated in DeWitt County, Texas,
 and more particularly described as follows:
 BEING all that certain parcel or tract containing 100.00 Acres of
 land out of the Samuel Lockhart League A-28 located in DeWitt
 County, Texas, and being out of the easterly portion of a called
 464.03-Acre tract described in deed to the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice-State of Texas from the City of Cuero recorded in
 Vol. 360 Page 139 in the deed records of said County;
 Said 100.00-Acre tract being bounded as follows:
 1.  On the north, by the northerly line of a said 464.03-Acre
 tract;
 2.  One the east, by the easterly line of said 464.03-Acre
 tract;
 3.  On the south, by the southerly line of said 464.03-Acre
 tract;
 4.  On the west, by a line being perpendicular to the
 southerly line of said 464.03-Acre tract, at a location
 sufficiently west of the easterly line of said 464.03-Acre tract so
 as to include exactly 100.00 Acres of land.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3636 was passed by the House on April
 18, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3636 on May 24, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3636 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3636 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3636 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor