Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3636 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Morrison (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 3636
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3636 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of jurisdiction over and management of the
 Star of the Republic Museum to the Texas Historical Commission and
 the transfer of certain state property from the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice to DeWitt County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 442, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter B-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B-1. STAR OF THE REPUBLIC MUSEUM
 Sec. 442.061.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "museum"
 means the Star of the Republic Museum.
 Sec. 442.062.  JURISDICTION AND MAINTENANCE OF MUSEUM. (a)
 The museum and its contents are under the jurisdiction of the Texas
 Historical Commission. The commission is responsible for the
 preservation, maintenance, and operation of the museum.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), Blinn College District
 maintains ownership of the museum, the land on which the museum is
 located, and the artifacts in the museum.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), any power or duty
 related to the museum formerly vested in any other state agency or
 entity is vested solely in the commission.
 (d)  The commission shall, in coordination with an advisory
 committee appointed by the board of trustees of the Blinn College
 District, promote the educational and public awareness programs at
 the museum, the Washington-on-the-Brazos State Historic Site, and
 the Barrington Living History Farm.
 Sec. 442.063.  GRANTS; DONATIONS. The commission may accept
 a grant or donation for any program or purpose of the museum.
 SECTION 2.  (a) On January 1, 2020, the following are
 transferred to the Texas Historical Commission:
 (1)  all powers and duties of Blinn College District
 relating to the Star of the Republic Museum;
 (2)  all unobligated and unexpended funds
 appropriated, donated, or contributed to Blinn College District
 designated for the administration of any part of the Star of the
 Republic Museum; and
 (3)  all files and other records of Blinn College
 District kept by Blinn College District regarding the Star of the
 Republic Museum.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, Blinn College District
 shall continue to perform functions and activities related to the
 Star of the Republic Museum until January 1, 2020, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Not later than December 31, 2029, and
 subject to Subsections (b), (c), and (d) of this section, the Texas
 Board of Criminal Justice shall transfer to DeWitt County the real
 property described by Subsection (e) of this section.
 (b)  The transfer authorized by Subsection (a) of this
 section must be for consideration in an amount not less than the
 fair market value of the property. The historical fair market value
 of the real property as of December 2, 1992, shall be offered to
 establish the fair market value of the property.
 (c)  The General Land Office shall negotiate and close a
 transaction under this section on behalf of the Texas Board of
 Criminal Justice.
 (d)  Section 31.158, Natural Resources Code, does not apply
 to a transaction under this section.
 (e)  The real property held by the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice is land being situated in DeWitt County, Texas,
 and more particularly described as follows:
 BEING all that certain parcel or tract containing 100.00 Acres of
 land out of the Samuel Lockhart League A-28 located in DeWitt
 County, Texas, and being out of the easterly portion of a called
 464.03-Acre tract described in deed to the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice-State of Texas from the City of Cuero recorded in
 Vol. 360 Page 139 in the deed records of said County;
 Said 100.00-Acre tract being bounded as follows:
 1.  On the north, by the northerly line of a said 464.03-Acre
 tract;
 2.  One the east, by the easterly line of said 464.03-Acre
 tract;
 3.  On the south, by the southerly line of said 464.03-Acre
 tract;
 4.  On the west, by a line being perpendicular to the
 southerly line of said 464.03-Acre tract, at a location
 sufficiently west of the easterly line of said 464.03-Acre tract so
 as to include exactly 100.00 Acres of land.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *