H.B. No. 3636 AN ACT relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Texas Department of Criminal Justice to DeWitt County. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) Not later than December 31, 2029, and subject to Subsections (b), (c), and (d) of this section, the Texas Board of Criminal Justice shall transfer to DeWitt County the real property described by Section 2 of this Act. (b) The transfer authorized by Subsection (a) of this section must be for consideration in an amount not less than the fair market value of the property. The historical fair market value of the real property as of December 2, 1992, shall be offered to establish the fair market value of the property. (c) The General Land Office shall negotiate and close a transaction under this section on behalf of the Texas Board of Criminal Justice. (d) Section 31.158, Natural Resources Code, does not apply to a transaction under this section. SECTION 2. The real property held by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice is land being situated in DeWitt County, Texas, and more particularly described as follows: BEING all that certain parcel or tract containing 100.00 Acres of land out of the Samuel Lockhart League A-28 located in DeWitt County, Texas, and being out of the easterly portion of a called 464.03-Acre tract described in deed to the Texas Department of Criminal Justice-State of Texas from the City of Cuero recorded in Vol. 360 Page 139 in the deed records of said County; Said 100.00-Acre tract being bounded as follows: 1. On the north, by the northerly line of a said 464.03-Acre tract; 2. One the east, by the easterly line of said 464.03-Acre tract; 3. On the south, by the southerly line of said 464.03-Acre tract; 4. On the west, by a line being perpendicular to the southerly line of said 464.03-Acre tract, at a location sufficiently west of the easterly line of said 464.03-Acre tract so as to include exactly 100.00 Acres of land. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3636 was passed by the House on April 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 3636 on May 24, 2019, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 3636 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3636 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 3636 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor