Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 2, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019