Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB374 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 374
1+By: Allen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 374
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2019;
3+ April 4, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Criminal Justice; April 23, 2019, reported adversely, with
5+ favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6,
6+ Nays 0; April 23, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 374 By: Huffman
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to meetings or visits between a defendant on community
614 supervision and a supervision officer.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Chapter 76, Government Code, is amended by
917 adding Section 76.019 to read as follows:
1018 Sec. 76.019. SUPERVISION OFFICER MEETINGS AND VISITS. (a)
1119 A department shall adopt a policy regarding the scheduling of
1220 meetings or visits with a defendant placed on community supervision
1321 and supervised by the department. The policy must require the
1422 officer supervising the defendant to take into consideration the
1523 defendant's work, treatment, or community service schedule, as
1624 applicable, when scheduling any required meetings or visits.
1725 (b) A department may permit a defendant to report to the
1826 officer supervising the defendant by use of videoconference
1927 technology if the department determines that an in-person meeting
2028 or visit is unnecessary.
2129 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2020, each community
2230 supervision and corrections department shall adopt the policy
2331 required by Section 76.019, Government Code, as added by this Act.
2432 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
25- ______________________________ ______________________________
26- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
27- I certify that H.B. No. 374 was passed by the House on April
28- 2, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 5, 1 present, not
29- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
30- No. 374 on May 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 106, Nays 0, 1
31- present, not voting.
32- ______________________________
33- Chief Clerk of the House
34- I certify that H.B. No. 374 was passed by the Senate, with
35- amendments, on May 1, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
36- ______________________________
37- Secretary of the Senate
38- APPROVED: __________________
39- Date
40- __________________
41- Governor
33+ * * * * *