Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB374 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/10/2019

                            H.B. No. 374


 AN ACT
 relating to meetings or visits between a defendant on community
 supervision and a supervision officer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 76, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 76.019 to read as follows:
 Sec. 76.019.  SUPERVISION OFFICER MEETINGS AND VISITS. (a)
 A department shall adopt a policy regarding the scheduling of
 meetings or visits with a defendant placed on community supervision
 and supervised by the department. The policy must require the
 officer supervising the defendant to take into consideration the
 defendant's work, treatment, or community service schedule, as
 applicable, when scheduling any required meetings or visits.
 (b)  A department may permit a defendant to report to the
 officer supervising the defendant by use of videoconference
 technology if the department determines that an in-person meeting
 or visit is unnecessary.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2020, each community
 supervision and corrections department shall adopt the policy
 required by Section 76.019, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 374 was passed by the House on April
 2, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 5, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 374 on May 10, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 106, Nays 0, 1
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 374 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 1, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor