Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB53 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2019

                    By: Minjarez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Powell) H.B. No. 53
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 16, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transitional living services program for certain
 youth in foster care.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 264.121(a-2) and (f), Family Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-2)  The experiential life-skills training under
 Subsection (a-1) must include:
 (1)  a financial literacy education program developed
 in collaboration with the Office of Consumer Credit Commissioner
 and the State Securities Board that:
 (A) [(1)]  includes instruction on:
 (i) [(A)]  obtaining and interpreting a
 credit score;
 (ii) [(B)]  protecting, repairing, and
 improving a credit score;
 (iii) [(C)]  avoiding predatory lending
 practices;
 (iv) [(D)]  saving money and accomplishing
 financial goals through prudent financial management practices;
 (v) [(E)]  using basic banking and
 accounting skills, including balancing a checkbook;
 (vi) [(F)]  using debit and credit cards
 responsibly;
 (vii) [(G)]  understanding a paycheck and
 items withheld from a paycheck; [and]
 (viii)  understanding the time requirements
 and process for filing federal taxes;
 (ix) [(H)]  protecting financial, credit,
 and personally identifying information in personal and
 professional relationships and online;
 (x)  forms of identity and credit theft; and
 (xi)  using insurance to protect against the
 risk of financial loss; and
 (B) [(2)]  assists a youth who has a source of
 income to:
 (i)  establish a savings plan and, if
 available, a savings account that the youth can independently
 manage; and
 (ii)  prepare a monthly budget that includes
 the following expenses:
 (a)  rent based on the monthly rent for
 an apartment advertised for lease during the preceding month;
 (b)  utilities based on a reasonable
 utility bill in the area in which the youth resides;
 (c)  telephone service based on a
 reasonable bill for telephone service in the area in which the youth
 resides;
 (d)  Internet service based on a
 reasonable bill for Internet service in the area in which the youth
 resides; and
 (e)  other reasonable monthly
 expenses; and
 (2)  for youth who are 17 years of age or older, lessons
 related to:
 (A)  insurance, including applying for and
 obtaining automobile insurance and residential property insurance,
 including tenants insurance; and
 (B)  civic engagement, including the process for
 registering to vote, the places to vote, and resources for
 information regarding upcoming elections.
 (f)  The department shall require a person with whom the
 department contracts for transitional living services for foster
 youth to provide or assist youth in obtaining:
 (1)  housing services;
 (2)  job training and employment services;
 (3)  college preparation services;
 (4)  services that will assist youth in obtaining a
 general education development certificate;
 (5)  services that will assist youth in developing
 skills in food preparation;
 (6)  nutrition education that promotes healthy food
 choices;
 (7)  a savings or checking account if the youth is at
 least 18 years of age and has a source of income;
 (8)  mental health services;
 (9)  financial literacy education and civic engagement
 lessons required under Subsection (a-2); and
 (10) [(8)]  any other appropriate transitional living
 service identified by the department.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a person who enters into a contract with the Department of Family
 and Protective Services to provide transitional living services for
 foster youth on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *