Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB53 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019