Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB723 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2019

                    By: Larson (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 723
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
 Rural Affairs; April 26, 2019, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 26, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 723 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality obtain or develop updated water availability
 models for certain river basins.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 16.012, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (h-1) to read as follows:
 (h-1)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the commission shall
 obtain or develop updated water availability models for the Brazos
 River, Neches River, Red River, and Rio Grande river basins. The
 commission may collect data from all jurisdictions that allocate
 the waters of the rivers, including jurisdictions outside this
 state.  This subsection expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *