Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB723 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019