Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB723 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 723
1+By: Larson (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 723
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
3+ April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
4+ Rural Affairs; April 26, 2019, reported adversely, with
5+ favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7,
6+ Nays 0; April 26, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 723 By: Perry
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to a requirement that the Texas Commission on
614 Environmental Quality obtain or develop updated water availability
715 models for certain river basins.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Section 16.012, Water Code, is amended by adding
1018 Subsection (h-1) to read as follows:
1119 (h-1) Not later than December 1, 2022, the commission shall
1220 obtain or develop updated water availability models for the Brazos
1321 River, Neches River, Red River, and Rio Grande river basins. The
1422 commission may collect data from all jurisdictions that allocate
1523 the waters of the rivers, including jurisdictions outside this
1624 state. This subsection expires September 1, 2023.
1725 SECTION 2. The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality is
1826 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
1927 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
2028 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
2129 purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
2230 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
2331 purpose.
2432 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
25- ______________________________ ______________________________
26- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
27- I certify that H.B. No. 723 was passed by the House on April
28- 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 1, 1 present, not
29- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
30- No. 723 on May 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 106, Nays 0, 1
31- present, not voting.
32- ______________________________
33- Chief Clerk of the House
34- I certify that H.B. No. 723 was passed by the Senate, with
35- amendments, on May 1, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
36- ______________________________
37- Secretary of the Senate
38- APPROVED: __________________
39- Date
40- __________________
41- Governor
33+ * * * * *