Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB723 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/10/2019

                            H.B. No. 723


 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality obtain or develop updated water availability
 models for certain river basins.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 16.012, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (h-1) to read as follows:
 (h-1)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the commission shall
 obtain or develop updated water availability models for the Brazos
 River, Neches River, Red River, and Rio Grande river basins. The
 commission may collect data from all jurisdictions that allocate
 the waters of the rivers, including jurisdictions outside this
 state.  This subsection expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 723 was passed by the House on April
 10, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 1, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 723 on May 10, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 106, Nays 0, 1
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 723 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 1, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor