House | 05/09/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Filed |