House | 05/14/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Filed |