Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1017 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019