Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1017 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 1017


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the advisory council on postsecondary
 education for persons with intellectual and developmental
 disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.0663(b), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The board shall:
 (1)  post the inventory on the board's Internet website
 in an easily identifiable and accessible location;
 (2)  submit the inventory to the Texas Education Agency
 for inclusion in the transition and employment guide under Section
 29.0112; and
 (3)  update the inventory at least annually [once every
 two years].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.06641 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.06641.  ACCESS TO HIGHER EDUCATION FOR PERSONS WITH
 INTELLECTUAL AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES; ADVISORY COUNCIL.
 (a)  The board, with the assistance of the advisory council
 established under this section, shall:
 (1)  periodically review the policies and practices
 that increase access to higher education opportunities for persons
 with intellectual and developmental disabilities; and
 (2)  distribute educational outreach materials
 developed by the advisory council to increase awareness regarding
 postsecondary opportunities for persons with intellectual and
 developmental disabilities.
 (b)  The board shall establish an advisory council on
 postsecondary education for persons with intellectual and
 developmental disabilities, in accordance with Section 61.026, to
 advise the board on policies and practices to improve postsecondary
 education opportunities for persons with intellectual and
 developmental disabilities.
 (c)  The advisory council is composed of the following
 members appointed as follows:
 (1)  one member appointed by the executive director of
 the Texas Workforce Commission;
 (2)  one member appointed by the commissioner of the
 Texas Education Agency;
 (3)  a representative of the continuing advisory
 committee established under Section 29.006 appointed by the
 governor; and
 (4)  the following members appointed by the board:
 (A)  a representative of a University Centers for
 Excellence in Developmental Disabilities program in this state;
 (B)  a representative of a disability advocacy
 group;
 (C)  a parent or guardian of a person with an
 intellectual or developmental disability;
 (D)  a parent or guardian of a person with an
 intellectual or developmental disability who is currently enrolled
 in an institution of higher education;
 (E)  a person with an intellectual or
 developmental disability enrolled in an institution of higher
 education;
 (F)  a person with an intellectual or
 developmental disability who has completed a program at an
 institution of higher education;
 (G)  a high school counselor;
 (H)  a specialist in the transition to employment
 from a regional education service center, school district, or other
 state agency; and
 (I)  additional representatives with relevant
 experience, as needed.
 (d)  Members of the advisory council serve two-year terms.
 (e)  A member of the advisory council is not entitled to
 compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for actual and
 necessary expenses incurred by the member while conducting the
 business of the advisory council.
 (f)  The members of the advisory council shall elect a
 presiding officer from among the membership.
 (g)  The advisory council shall:
 (1)  study the accessibility of higher education for
 persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities;
 (2)  provide advice regarding resolving barriers to
 accessing higher education for persons with intellectual and
 developmental disabilities; and
 (3)  identify, evaluate, and develop recommendations
 to address barriers to accessing higher education for persons with
 intellectual and developmental disabilities who are or have been in
 the foster care system and any data collection issues in relation to
 those persons.
 (h)  The advisory council shall meet at least quarterly at
 the call of the presiding officer.
 (i)  Notwithstanding Chapter 551, Government Code, or any
 other law, the advisory council may meet by telephone conference
 call, videoconference, or other similar telecommunication method.
 A meeting held by telephone conference call, videoconference, or
 other similar telecommunication method is subject to the
 requirements of Sections 551.125(c)-(f), Government Code.
 (j)  The advisory council shall submit a report to the board
 annually, at a time determined by the board. The report must
 include information regarding:
 (1)  the advisory council's activities;
 (2)  any relevant rule changes necessary to decrease
 barriers to accessing higher education for persons with
 intellectual and developmental disabilities; and
 (3)  recommendations for potential outreach and
 education materials to increase public awareness of the
 availability of higher education opportunities and resources for
 persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities,
 including information regarding available grants, loan programs,
 and other resources that may require statewide outreach efforts.
 (k)  Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the advisory council shall provide a report to the board and to the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, the members of the legislature, and, as necessary,
 other state agencies or relevant stakeholders. The report must
 include:
 (1)  historic and current higher education data and
 related information regarding persons with intellectual and
 developmental disabilities, including:
 (A)  graduation rates;
 (B)  the geographic distribution of institutions
 of higher education providing appropriate opportunities;
 (C)  a description of available programs; and
 (D)  any other relevant data; and
 (2)  recommendations for changes to support success and
 achievement for persons with intellectual and developmental
 disabilities in accessing higher education, including
 recommendations for:
 (A)  addressing gaps in data; and
 (B)  identifying problems with and barriers to
 accessing higher education.
 (l)  The board shall provide administrative support for the
 advisory council.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Not later than January 1, 2020, the
 appropriate appointing authorities shall appoint the members to the
 advisory council on postsecondary education for persons with
 intellectual and developmental disabilities as required by Section
 61.06641, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the advisory council on
 postsecondary education for persons with intellectual and
 developmental disabilities shall complete the initial reports
 required under Sections 61.06641(j) and (k), Education Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1017 passed the Senate on
 April 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1017 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor