Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1017 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1017
1+By: Powell, et al. S.B. No. 1017
2+ (Guerra)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the creation of the advisory council on postsecondary
68 education for persons with intellectual and developmental
79 disabilities.
810 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
911 SECTION 1. Section 61.0663(b), Education Code, is amended
1012 to read as follows:
1113 (b) The board shall:
1214 (1) post the inventory on the board's Internet website
1315 in an easily identifiable and accessible location;
1416 (2) submit the inventory to the Texas Education Agency
1517 for inclusion in the transition and employment guide under Section
1618 29.0112; and
1719 (3) update the inventory at least annually [once every
1820 two years].
1921 SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
2022 amended by adding Section 61.06641 to read as follows:
2123 Sec. 61.06641. ACCESS TO HIGHER EDUCATION FOR PERSONS WITH
2224 INTELLECTUAL AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES; ADVISORY COUNCIL.
2325 (a) The board, with the assistance of the advisory council
2426 established under this section, shall:
2527 (1) periodically review the policies and practices
2628 that increase access to higher education opportunities for persons
2729 with intellectual and developmental disabilities; and
2830 (2) distribute educational outreach materials
2931 developed by the advisory council to increase awareness regarding
3032 postsecondary opportunities for persons with intellectual and
3133 developmental disabilities.
3234 (b) The board shall establish an advisory council on
3335 postsecondary education for persons with intellectual and
3436 developmental disabilities, in accordance with Section 61.026, to
3537 advise the board on policies and practices to improve postsecondary
3638 education opportunities for persons with intellectual and
3739 developmental disabilities.
3840 (c) The advisory council is composed of the following
3941 members appointed as follows:
4042 (1) one member appointed by the executive director of
4143 the Texas Workforce Commission;
4244 (2) one member appointed by the commissioner of the
4345 Texas Education Agency;
4446 (3) a representative of the continuing advisory
4547 committee established under Section 29.006 appointed by the
4648 governor; and
4749 (4) the following members appointed by the board:
4850 (A) a representative of a University Centers for
4951 Excellence in Developmental Disabilities program in this state;
5052 (B) a representative of a disability advocacy
5153 group;
5254 (C) a parent or guardian of a person with an
5355 intellectual or developmental disability;
5456 (D) a parent or guardian of a person with an
5557 intellectual or developmental disability who is currently enrolled
5658 in an institution of higher education;
5759 (E) a person with an intellectual or
5860 developmental disability enrolled in an institution of higher
5961 education;
6062 (F) a person with an intellectual or
6163 developmental disability who has completed a program at an
6264 institution of higher education;
6365 (G) a high school counselor;
6466 (H) a specialist in the transition to employment
6567 from a regional education service center, school district, or other
6668 state agency; and
6769 (I) additional representatives with relevant
6870 experience, as needed.
6971 (d) Members of the advisory council serve two-year terms.
7072 (e) A member of the advisory council is not entitled to
7173 compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for actual and
7274 necessary expenses incurred by the member while conducting the
7375 business of the advisory council.
7476 (f) The members of the advisory council shall elect a
7577 presiding officer from among the membership.
7678 (g) The advisory council shall:
7779 (1) study the accessibility of higher education for
7880 persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities;
7981 (2) provide advice regarding resolving barriers to
8082 accessing higher education for persons with intellectual and
8183 developmental disabilities; and
8284 (3) identify, evaluate, and develop recommendations
8385 to address barriers to accessing higher education for persons with
8486 intellectual and developmental disabilities who are or have been in
8587 the foster care system and any data collection issues in relation to
8688 those persons.
8789 (h) The advisory council shall meet at least quarterly at
8890 the call of the presiding officer.
8991 (i) Notwithstanding Chapter 551, Government Code, or any
9092 other law, the advisory council may meet by telephone conference
9193 call, videoconference, or other similar telecommunication method.
9294 A meeting held by telephone conference call, videoconference, or
9395 other similar telecommunication method is subject to the
9496 requirements of Sections 551.125(c)-(f), Government Code.
9597 (j) The advisory council shall submit a report to the board
9698 annually, at a time determined by the board. The report must
9799 include information regarding:
98100 (1) the advisory council's activities;
99101 (2) any relevant rule changes necessary to decrease
100102 barriers to accessing higher education for persons with
101103 intellectual and developmental disabilities; and
102104 (3) recommendations for potential outreach and
103105 education materials to increase public awareness of the
104106 availability of higher education opportunities and resources for
105107 persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities,
106108 including information regarding available grants, loan programs,
107109 and other resources that may require statewide outreach efforts.
108110 (k) Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year,
109111 the advisory council shall provide a report to the board and to the
110112 governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
111113 representatives, the members of the legislature, and, as necessary,
112114 other state agencies or relevant stakeholders. The report must
113115 include:
114116 (1) historic and current higher education data and
115117 related information regarding persons with intellectual and
116118 developmental disabilities, including:
117119 (A) graduation rates;
118120 (B) the geographic distribution of institutions
119121 of higher education providing appropriate opportunities;
120122 (C) a description of available programs; and
121123 (D) any other relevant data; and
122124 (2) recommendations for changes to support success and
123125 achievement for persons with intellectual and developmental
124126 disabilities in accessing higher education, including
125127 recommendations for:
126128 (A) addressing gaps in data; and
127129 (B) identifying problems with and barriers to
128130 accessing higher education.
129131 (l) The board shall provide administrative support for the
130132 advisory council.
131133 SECTION 3. (a) Not later than January 1, 2020, the
132134 appropriate appointing authorities shall appoint the members to the
133135 advisory council on postsecondary education for persons with
134136 intellectual and developmental disabilities as required by Section
135137 61.06641, Education Code, as added by this Act.
136138 (b) Not later than December 1, 2020, the advisory council on
137139 postsecondary education for persons with intellectual and
138140 developmental disabilities shall complete the initial reports
139141 required under Sections 61.06641(j) and (k), Education Code, as
140142 added by this Act.
141143 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
142144 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
143145 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
144146 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
145147 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
146- ______________________________ ______________________________
147- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
148- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1017 passed the Senate on
149- April 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
150- the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 25, 2019, by the
151- following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
152- ______________________________
153- Secretary of the Senate
154- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1017 passed the House, with
155- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
156- Nays 0, one present not voting.
157- ______________________________
158- Chief Clerk of the House
159- Approved:
160- ______________________________
161- Date
162- ______________________________
163- Governor