|
06/14/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
06/14/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote RV#1533
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment adopted as amended 1-Oliverson
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment amended 2-Oliverson
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Oliverson
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment adopted as amended FA1 Hancock
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA6 Schwertner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA5 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA4 Schwertner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA3 Schwertner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA2 Huffman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|