|
05/28/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
05/28/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/17/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Record vote RV#1361
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|