Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1413 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 15, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019