Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB15 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+86R9497 JSC-F
12 By: Creighton, Buckingham, Campbell S.B. No. 15
2- (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2019; February 14, 2019,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
4- Economic Development; February 25, 2019, rereferred to Committee
5- on State Affairs; March 4, 2019, reported adversely, with
6- favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6,
7- Nays 1; March 4, 2019, sent to printer.)
8-Click here to see the committee vote
9- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 15 By: Creighton
103
114
125 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
136 AN ACT
14- relating to a prohibition against certain local regulation of
15- private employers.
7+ relating to the regulation by a municipality or county of certain
8+ employment benefits and policies.
169 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
17- SECTION 1. Title 3, Labor Code, is amended by adding Chapter
18- 106 to read as follows:
19- CHAPTER 106. PROHIBITION AGAINST LOCAL REGULATION OF EMPLOYMENT
10+ SECTION 1. Subtitle D, Title 2, Labor Code, is amended by
11+ adding Chapter 83 to read as follows:
12+ CHAPTER 83. PROHIBITION AGAINST LOCAL REGULATION OF EMPLOYMENT
2013 BENEFITS AND POLICIES
21- Sec. 106.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
22- (1) "Applicant" means a person who has made an oral or
23- written application with a private employer, or has sent a resume or
24- other correspondence to a private employer, indicating an interest
25- in employment.
26- (2) "Criminal history record information" has the
27- meaning assigned by Section 411.082, Government Code.
28- (3) "Employee" means an individual who is employed by
14+ Sec. 83.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
15+ (1) "Employee" means an individual who is employed by
2916 an employer for compensation.
30- (4) "Employer" means a person who employs one or more
17+ (2) "Employer" means a person who employs one or more
3118 employees.
32- (5) "Employment benefit" means anything of value that
33- an employee receives from an employer in addition to monetary
34- compensation.
35- Sec. 106.002. EMPLOYMENT LEAVE, EMPLOYMENT BENEFITS, AND
36- OTHER TERMS OF EMPLOYMENT. (a) A political subdivision of this
37- state may not adopt or enforce an ordinance, order, rule,
38- regulation, or policy regulating a private employer's terms of
39- employment relating to:
40- (1) any form of employment leave, including paid days
41- off from work for holidays, sick leave, vacation, and personal
42- necessity;
43- (2) employment benefits other than employment leave,
44- including health, disability, retirement, profit-sharing, death,
45- and group accidental death and dismemberment benefits; or
46- (3) scheduling practices.
19+ (3) "Employment benefit" means anything of value that
20+ an employee receives from an employer beyond regular salary or
21+ wages.
22+ Sec. 83.002. PROHIBITION AGAINST MUNICIPALITY OR COUNTY
23+ REQUIRING CERTAIN EMPLOYMENT BENEFITS OR POLICIES. (a) A
24+ municipality or county may not adopt or enforce an ordinance,
25+ order, rule, regulation, or policy requiring any terms of
26+ employment that exceed or conflict with federal or state law
27+ relating to any form of employment leave, hiring practices,
28+ employment benefits, scheduling practices, or other terms of
29+ employment.
4730 (b) An ordinance, order, rule, regulation, or policy that
4831 violates Subsection (a) is void and unenforceable.
49- Sec. 106.003. CONSIDERATION OF CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD
50- INFORMATION OF EMPLOYMENT APPLICANT OR EMPLOYEE. A political
51- subdivision of this state may not adopt or enforce any ordinance,
52- order, rule, regulation, or policy that prohibits, limits, or
53- otherwise regulates a private employer's ability to request,
54- consider, or take employment action based on the criminal history
55- record information of an applicant or employee.
56- SECTION 2. Chapter 106, Labor Code, as added by this Act,
32+ (c) This chapter does not affect:
33+ (1) the Texas Minimum Wage Act under Chapter 62;
34+ (2) an ordinance, order, rule, regulation, or policy
35+ that prohibits employment discrimination, regardless of whether
36+ the ordinance, order, rule, regulation, or policy is adopted
37+ before, on, or after September 1, 2019; or
38+ (3) a contract or agreement relating to terms of
39+ employment voluntarily entered into between a private employer or
40+ entity and a governmental entity.
41+ SECTION 2. Chapter 83, Labor Code, as added by this Act,
5742 applies to an ordinance, order, rule, regulation, or policy adopted
5843 before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
5944 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
60- * * * * *