Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB15 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/04/2019

                            By: Creighton, Buckingham, Campbell S.B. No. 15
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2019; February 14, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; February 25, 2019, rereferred to Committee
 on State Affairs; March 4, 2019, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 1; March 4, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 15 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a prohibition against certain local regulation of
 private employers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 3, Labor Code, is amended by adding Chapter
 106 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 106. PROHIBITION AGAINST LOCAL REGULATION OF EMPLOYMENT
 BENEFITS AND POLICIES
 Sec. 106.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Applicant" means a person who has made an oral or
 written application with a private employer, or has sent a resume or
 other correspondence to a private employer, indicating an interest
 in employment.
 (2)  "Criminal history record information" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 411.082, Government Code.
 (3)  "Employee" means an individual who is employed by
 an employer for compensation.
 (4)  "Employer" means a person who employs one or more
 employees.
 (5)  "Employment benefit" means anything of value that
 an employee receives from an employer in addition to monetary
 compensation.
 Sec. 106.002.  EMPLOYMENT LEAVE, EMPLOYMENT BENEFITS, AND
 OTHER TERMS OF EMPLOYMENT. (a)  A political subdivision of this
 state may not adopt or enforce an ordinance, order, rule,
 regulation, or policy regulating a private employer's terms of
 employment relating to:
 (1)  any form of employment leave, including paid days
 off from work for holidays, sick leave, vacation, and personal
 necessity;
 (2)  employment benefits other than employment leave,
 including health, disability, retirement, profit-sharing, death,
 and group accidental death and dismemberment benefits; or
 (3)  scheduling practices.
 (b)  An ordinance, order, rule, regulation, or policy that
 violates Subsection (a) is void and unenforceable.
 Sec. 106.003.  CONSIDERATION OF CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD
 INFORMATION OF EMPLOYMENT APPLICANT OR EMPLOYEE. A political
 subdivision of this state may not adopt or enforce any ordinance,
 order, rule, regulation, or policy that prohibits, limits, or
 otherwise regulates a private employer's ability to request,
 consider, or take employment action based on the criminal history
 record information of an applicant or employee.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 106, Labor Code, as added by this Act,
 applies to an ordinance, order, rule, regulation, or policy adopted
 before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *