Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1738 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+86R12007 BEE-D
12 By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1738
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
4- May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
5- Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
73
84
95 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
106 AN ACT
117 relating to an education and training program on interacting with
128 and supporting individuals with intellectual and developmental
139 disabilities for certain public transportation vehicle operators.
1410 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1511 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 451, Transportation Code,
1612 is amended by adding Section 451.114 to read as follows:
1713 Sec. 451.114. REQUIRED EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROGRAM ON
1814 INDIVIDUALS WITH INTELLECTUAL AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES:
19- CERTAIN AUTHORITIES. (a) This section applies only to an
20- authority created before 1980 in which the principal municipality
21- has a population of less than 1.9 million.
15+ CERTAIN AUTHORITIES. (a) This section applies only to an authority
16+ created before 1980 in which the principal municipality has a
17+ population of less than 1.9 million.
2218 (b) An authority shall establish an education and training
2319 program on interacting with and supporting individuals with
2420 intellectual and developmental disabilities for employees of the
2521 authority who operate vehicles used to provide public
2622 transportation services for the authority. The program must
2723 include instruction relating to:
2824 (1) identifying and communicating with individuals
2925 with intellectual or developmental disabilities; and
3026 (2) assisting an individual with an intellectual or
3127 developmental disability to safely enter and exit a vehicle used to
3228 provide public transportation services.
3329 (c) An authority, or a person with whom the authority
3430 contracts, may not allow an employee to operate a vehicle used to
3531 provide public transportation services for the authority unless the
3632 employee has completed the training program established by the
3733 authority under this section.
3834 SECTION 2. Not later than March 1, 2020, a rapid transit
3935 authority shall establish the training program as required by
4036 Section 451.114, Transportation Code, as added by this Act.
41- SECTION 3. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
42- this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
37+ SECTION 3. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
38+ section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
4339 (b) Section 451.114(c), Transportation Code, as added by
4440 this Act, takes effect September 1, 2020.
45- * * * * *