Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1738 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/08/2019

                            By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1738
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an education and training program on interacting with
 and supporting individuals with intellectual and developmental
 disabilities for certain public transportation vehicle operators.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 451, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 451.114 to read as follows:
 Sec. 451.114.  REQUIRED EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROGRAM ON
 INDIVIDUALS WITH INTELLECTUAL AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES:
 CERTAIN AUTHORITIES. (a)  This section applies only to an
 authority created before 1980 in which the principal municipality
 has a population of less than 1.9 million.
 (b)  An authority shall establish an education and training
 program on interacting with and supporting individuals with
 intellectual and developmental disabilities for employees of the
 authority who operate vehicles used to provide public
 transportation services for the authority. The program must
 include instruction relating to:
 (1)  identifying and communicating with individuals
 with intellectual or developmental disabilities; and
 (2)  assisting an individual with an intellectual or
 developmental disability to safely enter and exit a vehicle used to
 provide public transportation services.
 (c)  An authority, or a person with whom the authority
 contracts, may not allow an employee to operate a vehicle used to
 provide public transportation services for the authority unless the
 employee has completed the training program established by the
 authority under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than March 1, 2020, a rapid transit
 authority shall establish the training program as required by
 Section 451.114, Transportation Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 (b)  Section 451.114(c), Transportation Code, as added by
 this Act, takes effect September 1, 2020.
 * * * * *