Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1757 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019