Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1757 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 1757


 AN ACT
 relating to student loan repayment assistance under the math and
 science scholars loan repayment program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.9832, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  To be eligible to receive loan repayment assistance
 under this subchapter, a person must:
 (1)  apply annually for the loan repayment assistance
 in the manner prescribed by the board;
 (2)  be a United States citizen;
 (3)  have completed an undergraduate or graduate
 program in mathematics or science;
 (4)  have a cumulative grade point average of at least
 3.0 [3.5] on a four-point scale or the equivalent;
 (5)  be:
 (A)  certified under Subchapter B, Chapter 21, to
 teach mathematics or science in a public school in this state; or
 (B)  teaching under a probationary teaching
 certificate;
 (6)  have been employed for at least one year as a
 teacher teaching mathematics or science at a public school that
 receives funding under Title I, Elementary and Secondary Education
 Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. Section 6301 et seq.);
 (7)  not be in default on any other education loan;
 (8)  not receive any other state or federal loan
 repayment assistance, including a Teacher Education Assistance for
 College and Higher Education (TEACH) Grant or teacher loan
 forgiveness;
 (9)  enter into an agreement with the board under
 Subsection (c); and
 (10)  comply with any other requirement adopted by the
 board under this subchapter.
 (c)  To receive loan repayment assistance under this
 subchapter, a person must enter into an agreement with the board
 that includes the following provisions:
 (1)  the person will accept an offer of full-time
 employment to teach mathematics or science, as applicable based on
 the person's certification, in a public school that receives
 funding under Title I, Elementary and Secondary Education Act of
 1965 (20 U.S.C. Section 6301 et seq.);
 (2)  the person will complete four consecutive years of
 employment as a full-time classroom teacher in a school described
 by Subdivision (1) whose primary duty is to teach mathematics or
 science, as applicable, based on the person's certification;
 (3)  beginning with the school year immediately
 following the last of the four consecutive school years described
 by Subdivision (2), the person will complete an [four] additional
 number of consecutive school years teaching in any public school in
 this state, as prescribed by board rule; and
 (4)  the person acknowledges the conditional nature of
 the loan repayment assistance.
 (c-1)  The rules adopted under Subsection (c)(3) may not
 require a person to complete more than four additional consecutive
 school years of teaching as described by that subdivision.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.9835(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The board may provide repayment assistance under this
 subchapter for the repayment of any student loan that:
 (1)  is for education at:
 (A)  a public or private institution of higher
 education; or
 (B)  a nonprofit, tax-exempt, regionally
 accredited college or university operating in accordance with a
 memorandum of understanding with this state under an executive
 order issued by the governor; and
 (2)  is received by an eligible person through an
 eligible lender.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  As soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act, the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall adopt rules necessary to administer Section 61.9832,
 Education Code, as amended by this Act.
 (b)  Section 61.9832, Education Code, as amended by this Act,
 applies only to a loan repayment assistance agreement entered into
 under Subchapter KK, Chapter 61, Education Code, on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A loan repayment assistance agreement
 entered into before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect immediately before that date, and the former law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1757 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1757 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 101,
 Nays 41, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor