Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1764 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019