Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1764 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/06/2019

                            S.B. No. 1764


 AN ACT
 relating to emergency contact and medical information maintained by
 the Department of Public Safety.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.060(e), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  The forms and procedures established and maintained
 under Subsection (d) must:
 (1)  comply with Subsection (c); and
 (2)  allow the holder of a driver's license or personal
 identification certificate or an authorized agent of the holder to
 add, amend, or delete information described by Subsection (d) by
 submitting an electronic form on the department's Internet website.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2020, the Department of
 Public Safety of the State of Texas shall produce and make available
 on the department's Internet website an electronic form in
 accordance with Section 521.060(e), Transportation Code, as
 amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1764 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1764 passed the House on
 May 3, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor