Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1794 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2019
Bill April 24, 2019