Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1940 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019