Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1940 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/21/2019

                            S.B. No. 1940


 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of a temporary health insurance risk
 pool.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1510.002, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1510.002.  ESTABLISHMENT OF TEMPORARY HEALTH INSURANCE
 RISK POOL.  To the extent that federal funds are [become] available
 under federal law[, regulation, or executive action after March 1,
 2017], the commissioner may:
 (1)  apply for such funds; and
 (2)  use such funds to establish and administer a
 temporary health insurance risk pool for the purposes of this
 chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1510.003, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The exclusive purpose of the pool is to provide a
 temporary mechanism [for maximizing available federal funding] to
 assist residents of this state in obtaining access to quality,
 guaranteed issue health coverage [care] at minimum cost to the
 public.
 (c)  The pool may not be used in a manner that requires this
 state to assume functions currently performed by the United States
 Department of Health and Human Services or the United States
 Internal Revenue Service under the Patient Protection and
 Affordable Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148), including establishing
 an exchange or administering premium tax credits.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1510.004, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1510.004.  PROVISION OF GUARANTEED ISSUE HEALTH
 COVERAGE. (a)  Subject to any requirements for obtaining federal
 funds [held in the pool], the commissioner may increase access to
 guaranteed issue health coverage by [use pool funds]:
 (1)  establishing a high risk pool to provide
 alternative individual health insurance coverage to eligible
 individuals that does not diminish enrollment in [the availability
 of] traditional commercial health care coverage;
 (2)  providing [to provide] funding to individual
 health benefit plan issuers that cover individuals with certain
 health or cost characteristics in exchange for lower enrollee
 premium rates; or
 (3)  providing [to provide] a reinsurance program for
 health benefit plan issuers in the individual market in exchange
 for lower enrollee premium rates.
 (b)  If necessary to ensure access to quality individual
 health insurance coverage for individuals with preexisting
 conditions, the commissioner may take actions necessary to
 establish a temporary high risk pool substantially similar to the
 risk pool authorized by former Chapter 1506, Insurance Code,
 repealed by Chapter 615 (S.B. 1367), Acts of the 83rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2013, including:
 (1)  appointing a board of directors to govern the
 temporary high risk pool;
 (2)  adopting rules or a plan of operation for the
 temporary high risk pool; and
 (3)  contracting with a third party.
 (c)  Any rule or plan of operation adopted under Subsection
 (b) remains in effect only until 30 days following the end of the
 next regular session of the legislature unless a law is enacted that
 authorizes coverage to be issued by the temporary risk pool and
 provides for funding for coverage under the temporary risk pool.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1510.008(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The commissioner may apply to the United States
 secretary of health and human services:
 (1)  under 42 U.S.C. Section 18052 for a waiver of
 applicable provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care
 Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148) and any applicable regulations or
 guidance; or
 (2)  under any applicable provision of federal law
 [enacted on or after May 1, 2017,] for a waiver of applicable
 provisions of any federal law, regulations, or guidance with
 respect to health insurance coverage consistent with Section
 1510.003.
 SECTION 5.  Section 1510.012(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Beginning June 1, 2020 [2018], not later than June 1 of
 each year, the department shall submit a report to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives.
 SECTION 6.  Section 1510.013, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1510.013.  EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter expires
 August 31, 2021 [2019].
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1940 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1940 passed the House on
 May 21, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 1, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor