Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1940 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1940
1+By: Hancock S.B. No. 1940
2+ (Oliverson)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the administration of a temporary health insurance risk
68 pool.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Section 1510.002, Insurance Code, is amended to
911 read as follows:
1012 Sec. 1510.002. ESTABLISHMENT OF TEMPORARY HEALTH INSURANCE
1113 RISK POOL. To the extent that federal funds are [become] available
1214 under federal law[, regulation, or executive action after March 1,
1315 2017], the commissioner may:
1416 (1) apply for such funds; and
1517 (2) use such funds to establish and administer a
1618 temporary health insurance risk pool for the purposes of this
1719 chapter.
1820 SECTION 2. Section 1510.003, Insurance Code, is amended by
1921 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
2022 follows:
2123 (a) The exclusive purpose of the pool is to provide a
2224 temporary mechanism [for maximizing available federal funding] to
2325 assist residents of this state in obtaining access to quality,
2426 guaranteed issue health coverage [care] at minimum cost to the
2527 public.
2628 (c) The pool may not be used in a manner that requires this
2729 state to assume functions currently performed by the United States
2830 Department of Health and Human Services or the United States
2931 Internal Revenue Service under the Patient Protection and
3032 Affordable Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148), including establishing
3133 an exchange or administering premium tax credits.
3234 SECTION 3. Section 1510.004, Insurance Code, is amended to
3335 read as follows:
3436 Sec. 1510.004. PROVISION OF GUARANTEED ISSUE HEALTH
3537 COVERAGE. (a) Subject to any requirements for obtaining federal
3638 funds [held in the pool], the commissioner may increase access to
3739 guaranteed issue health coverage by [use pool funds]:
3840 (1) establishing a high risk pool to provide
3941 alternative individual health insurance coverage to eligible
4042 individuals that does not diminish enrollment in [the availability
4143 of] traditional commercial health care coverage;
4244 (2) providing [to provide] funding to individual
4345 health benefit plan issuers that cover individuals with certain
4446 health or cost characteristics in exchange for lower enrollee
4547 premium rates; or
4648 (3) providing [to provide] a reinsurance program for
4749 health benefit plan issuers in the individual market in exchange
4850 for lower enrollee premium rates.
4951 (b) If necessary to ensure access to quality individual
5052 health insurance coverage for individuals with preexisting
5153 conditions, the commissioner may take actions necessary to
5254 establish a temporary high risk pool substantially similar to the
5355 risk pool authorized by former Chapter 1506, Insurance Code,
5456 repealed by Chapter 615 (S.B. 1367), Acts of the 83rd Legislature,
5557 Regular Session, 2013, including:
5658 (1) appointing a board of directors to govern the
5759 temporary high risk pool;
5860 (2) adopting rules or a plan of operation for the
5961 temporary high risk pool; and
6062 (3) contracting with a third party.
6163 (c) Any rule or plan of operation adopted under Subsection
6264 (b) remains in effect only until 30 days following the end of the
6365 next regular session of the legislature unless a law is enacted that
6466 authorizes coverage to be issued by the temporary risk pool and
6567 provides for funding for coverage under the temporary risk pool.
6668 SECTION 4. Section 1510.008(a), Insurance Code, is amended
6769 to read as follows:
6870 (a) The commissioner may apply to the United States
6971 secretary of health and human services:
7072 (1) under 42 U.S.C. Section 18052 for a waiver of
7173 applicable provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care
7274 Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148) and any applicable regulations or
7375 guidance; or
7476 (2) under any applicable provision of federal law
7577 [enacted on or after May 1, 2017,] for a waiver of applicable
7678 provisions of any federal law, regulations, or guidance with
7779 respect to health insurance coverage consistent with Section
7880 1510.003.
7981 SECTION 5. Section 1510.012(a), Insurance Code, is amended
8082 to read as follows:
8183 (a) Beginning June 1, 2020 [2018], not later than June 1 of
8284 each year, the department shall submit a report to the governor, the
8385 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
8486 representatives.
8587 SECTION 6. Section 1510.013, Insurance Code, is amended to
8688 read as follows:
8789 Sec. 1510.013. EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter expires
8890 August 31, 2021 [2019].
8991 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
9092 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
9193 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
9294 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
9395 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
94- ______________________________ ______________________________
95- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
96- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1940 passed the Senate on
97- April 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
98- ______________________________
99- Secretary of the Senate
100- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1940 passed the House on
101- May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 1, one
102- present not voting.
103- ______________________________
104- Chief Clerk of the House
105- Approved:
106- ______________________________
107- Date
108- ______________________________
109- Governor