Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB239 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2018

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019