Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2431 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+86R13798 SRS-F
12 By: Taylor S.B. No. 2431
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 16, 2019,
4- reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
5- following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
7- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2431 By: Taylor
83
94
105 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
116 AN ACT
127 relating to the creation of a committee to recommend a framework to
138 incorporate digital teaching and learning in public schools.
149 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1510 SECTION 1. Chapter 39, Education Code, is amended by adding
1611 Subchapter O to read as follows:
1712 SUBCHAPTER O. NEXT GENERATION COMMISSION ON DIGITAL LEARNING
1813 Sec. 39.601. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "commission"
1914 means the Next Generation Commission on Digital Learning.
2015 Sec. 39.602. NEXT GENERATION COMMISSION ON DIGITAL
2116 LEARNING. (a) The Next Generation Commission on Digital Learning
2217 is established to develop and make recommendations for establishing
2318 a framework for the incorporation of digital teaching and learning
2419 in public schools.
2520 (b) The commission is composed of 15 members, consisting of
2621 the following:
2722 (1) four members appointed by the governor;
2823 (2) three members appointed by the lieutenant
2924 governor;
3025 (3) three members appointed by the speaker of the
3126 house of representatives;
3227 (4) the chair of the senate committee on education, or
3328 a representative designated by the chair;
3429 (5) the chair of the senate committee on higher
3530 education, or a representative designated by the chair;
3631 (6) the chair of the house of representatives public
3732 education committee, or a representative designated by the chair;
3833 (7) the chair of the house of representatives
3934 committee on higher education, or a representative designated by
4035 the chair; and
4136 (8) a member of the State Board of Education, as
4237 designated by the chair of that board.
4338 (c) In making appointments under Subsections (b)(1), (2),
4439 and (3), the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
4540 house of representatives shall coordinate to ensure that the
4641 commission includes at least one of each of the following
4742 representatives:
4843 (1) a parent of or person standing in parental
4944 relation to a student enrolled in the public school system;
5045 (2) an educator in the public school system;
5146 (3) an educator in a school district that is a
5247 participant in the Texas High Performance Schools Consortium under
5348 Section 7.0561;
5449 (4) a member of the business community;
5550 (5) a member of the civic community;
5651 (6) a leader in digital teaching and learning; and
5752 (7) a leader in researching the impact of digital
5853 teaching and learning on student performance.
5954 Sec. 39.603. PRESIDING OFFICER. The governor shall
6055 designate the presiding officer of the commission.
6156 Sec. 39.604. COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT. A member of
6257 the commission is not entitled to compensation for service on the
6358 commission but is entitled to reimbursement for actual and
6459 necessary expenses incurred in performing commission duties.
6560 Sec. 39.605. ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT AND FUNDING.
6661 (a) Staff members of the agency shall provide administrative
6762 support for the commission.
6863 (b) Funding for the administrative and operational expenses
6964 of the commission shall be provided by appropriation to the agency
7065 for that purpose.
7166 Sec. 39.606. RECOMMENDATIONS. The commission shall develop
7267 recommendations under this subchapter to:
7368 (1) provide a funding proposal to present to the
7469 legislature for digital teaching and learning in elementary and
7570 secondary schools that includes funding to:
7671 (A) improve student outcomes through the use of
7772 digital teaching and learning technology; and
7873 (B) provide high-quality professional learning
7974 for educators to improve student outcomes through the use of
8075 digital teaching and learning technology;
8176 (2) develop a framework for effective statewide
8277 deployment of digital teaching and learning materials in elementary
8378 and secondary schools; and
8479 (3) develop and implement strategies that assist
8580 school districts in the adoption and implementation of digital
8681 teaching and learning materials.
8782 Sec. 39.607. REPORT. Not later than September 1, 2020, the
8883 commission shall prepare and deliver a report to the governor and
8984 the legislature that recommends statutory changes to develop a
9085 framework to incorporate digital teaching and learning in public
9186 schools.
92- Sec. 39.608. PUBLIC MEETINGS AND PUBLIC INFORMATION.
93- (a) The commission may hold public meetings as needed to fulfill
94- its duties under this subchapter.
87+ Sec. 39.608. PUBLIC MEETINGS AND PUBLIC INFORMATION. (a)
88+ The commission may hold public meetings as needed to fulfill its
89+ duties under this subchapter.
9590 (b) The commission is subject to Chapters 551 and 552,
9691 Government Code.
9792 Sec. 39.609. COMMISSION ABOLISHED; EXPIRATION OF
9893 SUBCHAPTER. (a) The commission is abolished January 1, 2021.
9994 (b) This subchapter expires January 1, 2021.
100- SECTION 2. The Texas Education Agency is required to
101- implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
102- appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
103- legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
104- purpose, the Texas Education Agency may, but is not required to,
105- implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations
106- available for that purpose.
107- SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
95+ SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
10896 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
10997 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
11098 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
11199 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
112100 legislative session.
113- * * * * *