Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2431 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/16/2019

                            By: Taylor S.B. No. 2431
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 16, 2019,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2431 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a committee to recommend a framework to
 incorporate digital teaching and learning in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 39, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter O to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER O. NEXT GENERATION COMMISSION ON DIGITAL LEARNING
 Sec. 39.601.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "commission"
 means the Next Generation Commission on Digital Learning.
 Sec. 39.602.  NEXT GENERATION COMMISSION ON DIGITAL
 LEARNING. (a)  The Next Generation Commission on Digital Learning
 is established to develop and make recommendations for establishing
 a framework for the incorporation of digital teaching and learning
 in public schools.
 (b)  The commission is composed of 15 members, consisting of
 the following:
 (1)  four members appointed by the governor;
 (2)  three members appointed by the lieutenant
 governor;
 (3)  three members appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives;
 (4)  the chair of the senate committee on education, or
 a representative designated by the chair;
 (5)  the chair of the senate committee on higher
 education, or a representative designated by the chair;
 (6)  the chair of the house of representatives public
 education committee, or a representative designated by the chair;
 (7)  the chair of the house of representatives
 committee on higher education, or a representative designated by
 the chair; and
 (8)  a member of the State Board of Education, as
 designated by the chair of that board.
 (c)  In making appointments under Subsections (b)(1), (2),
 and (3), the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives shall coordinate to ensure that the
 commission includes at least one of each of the following
 representatives:
 (1)  a parent of or person standing in parental
 relation to a student enrolled in the public school system;
 (2)  an educator in the public school system;
 (3)  an educator in a school district that is a
 participant in the Texas High Performance Schools Consortium under
 Section 7.0561;
 (4)  a member of the business community;
 (5)  a member of the civic community;
 (6)  a leader in digital teaching and learning; and
 (7)  a leader in researching the impact of digital
 teaching and learning on student performance.
 Sec. 39.603.  PRESIDING OFFICER. The governor shall
 designate the presiding officer of the commission.
 Sec. 39.604.  COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT. A member of
 the commission is not entitled to compensation for service on the
 commission but is entitled to reimbursement for actual and
 necessary expenses incurred in performing commission duties.
 Sec. 39.605.  ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT AND FUNDING.
 (a)  Staff members of the agency shall provide administrative
 support for the commission.
 (b)  Funding for the administrative and operational expenses
 of the commission shall be provided by appropriation to the agency
 for that purpose.
 Sec. 39.606.  RECOMMENDATIONS. The commission shall develop
 recommendations under this subchapter to:
 (1)  provide a funding proposal to present to the
 legislature for digital teaching and learning in elementary and
 secondary schools that includes funding to:
 (A)  improve student outcomes through the use of
 digital teaching and learning technology; and
 (B)  provide high-quality professional learning
 for educators to improve student outcomes through the use of
 digital teaching and learning technology;
 (2)  develop a framework for effective statewide
 deployment of digital teaching and learning materials in elementary
 and secondary schools; and
 (3)  develop and implement strategies that assist
 school districts in the adoption and implementation of digital
 teaching and learning materials.
 Sec. 39.607.  REPORT. Not later than September 1, 2020, the
 commission shall prepare and deliver a report to the governor and
 the legislature that recommends statutory changes to develop a
 framework to incorporate digital teaching and learning in public
 schools.
 Sec. 39.608.  PUBLIC MEETINGS AND PUBLIC INFORMATION.
 (a)  The commission may hold public meetings as needed to fulfill
 its duties under this subchapter.
 (b)  The commission is subject to Chapters 551 and 552,
 Government Code.
 Sec. 39.609.  COMMISSION ABOLISHED; EXPIRATION OF
 SUBCHAPTER. (a)  The commission is abolished January 1, 2021.
 (b)  This subchapter expires January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Education Agency is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the Texas Education Agency may, but is not required to,
 implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations
 available for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session.
 * * * * *