Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB285 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2019

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 285
 (In the Senate - Filed January 3, 2019; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 1, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 285 By:  Alvarado


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information and outreach regarding hurricane
 preparedness and mitigation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 418.127 and 418.128 to read as follows:
 Sec. 418.127.  HURRICANE PREPAREDNESS. The governor shall
 issue a proclamation each year before hurricane season instructing:
 (1)  individuals, including residential and commercial
 property owners, to prepare their property and communities for the
 upcoming hurricane season;
 (2)  state agencies to review and update their
 hurricane preparedness plans; and
 (3)  the following entities, to the extent practicable,
 to conduct community outreach and education activities on hurricane
 preparedness between May 25 and May 31 of each year:
 (A)  municipalities and counties;
 (B)  the division;
 (C)  the Texas Education Agency;
 (D)  the office of the comptroller;
 (E)  the Texas Department of Insurance; and
 (F)  the Department of State Health Services.
 Sec. 418.128.  HOUSING ASSISTANCE INFORMATION. The General
 Land Office shall conduct a public information campaign each year
 before and during hurricane season to provide local officials and
 the public with information regarding housing assistance that may
 be available under state and federal law in the event of a major
 hurricane or flooding event, including information about types of
 assistance unavailable under that law.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *