Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB285 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/21/2019

                            S.B. No. 285


 AN ACT
 relating to information, outreach, and other actions regarding
 hurricane preparedness and mitigation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 418.127, 418.128, and 418.129 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 418.127.  HURRICANE PREPAREDNESS. The governor shall
 issue a proclamation each year before hurricane season instructing:
 (1)  individuals, including residential and commercial
 property owners, to prepare their property and communities for the
 upcoming hurricane season;
 (2)  state agencies to review and update their
 hurricane preparedness plans; and
 (3)  the following entities, to the extent practicable,
 to conduct community outreach and education activities on hurricane
 preparedness between May 25 and May 31 of each year:
 (A)  municipalities and counties;
 (B)  the division;
 (C)  the Texas Education Agency;
 (D)  the office of the comptroller;
 (E)  the Texas Department of Insurance; and
 (F)  the Department of State Health Services.
 Sec. 418.128.  STATE AGENCY HURRICANE PREPAREDNESS.
 (a)  Not later than the 30th day after the date the governor issues
 a proclamation under Section 418.127, the governor, in consultation
 with the division and each appropriate state agency as determined
 by the governor, shall publish on the office of the governor's
 Internet website a report on the preparedness of state agencies for
 hurricane response.  The report must include:
 (1)  a list of each state agency involved in this
 state's response to a hurricane;
 (2)  contact information for each state agency in the
 event of a hurricane, including the name, e-mail address, and
 telephone number of the officer or employee who manages the state
 agency's response to a hurricane; and
 (3)  whether the officer or employee under Subdivision
 (2) has completed the emergency management training course
 described by Section 418.005.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the governor may, by
 executive order, take any action necessary to ensure each state
 agency listed under Subsection (a)(1) is able to respond to a
 hurricane.  An executive order issued under this subsection must be
 published in the Texas Register and expires on the last day of the
 first regular session of the legislature to convene after the date
 the order is issued unless the governor specifies an earlier
 expiration date in the order.
 (c)  In this section, "response" includes any activity
 related to the prevention or discovery of, response to, or recovery
 from a hurricane.
 Sec. 418.129.  HOUSING ASSISTANCE INFORMATION. The General
 Land Office shall conduct a public information campaign each year
 before and during hurricane season to provide local officials and
 the public with information regarding housing assistance that may
 be available under state and federal law in the event of a major
 hurricane or flooding event, including information about types of
 assistance unavailable under that law.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 285 passed the Senate on
 April 4, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 285 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
 Nays 2, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor