Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB285 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019