Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB345 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019